AR HB1587 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Notification that HB1587 is now Act 701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Notification that HB1587 is now Act 701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Include In-laws In The Definition Of “family Or Household Members" For The Domestic Abuse Act Of 1991.
Title
To Include In-laws In The Definition Of “family Or Household Members" For The Domestic Abuse Act Of 1991.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Notification that HB1587 is now Act 701 |
2015-03-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-19 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2015-03-17 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |