AR HB1582 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Notification that HB1582 is now Act 803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize A Multiyear License Or Registration For A Physician By The Arkansas State Medical Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize A Multiyear License Or Registration For A Physician By The Arkansas State Medical Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseNotification that HB1582 is now Act 803
2021-04-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-15HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-15HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-15SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-15SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-22SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-01HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback