AR HB1570 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that HB1570 is now Act 626
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 65-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that HB1570 is now Act 626
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Save Adolescents From Experimentation (safe) Act.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Save Adolescents From Experimentation (safe) Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Override of Governor's Executive Veto passed (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Returned to the House as passed. (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Returned to the House as passed. (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Notification that HB1570 is now Act 626 |
2021-04-06 | House | Transmitted to the Governor's Office having overridden the Veto |
2021-04-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately returned to the House as passed having overriden the Governor's Veto. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Override of the Governor's Veto of HB1570. The override of the Governor's Veto passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion for Immediate Consideration. Motion passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion to reconsider the passage of HB1570 notwithstanding the veto of the Governor. Motion passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House having overriden the Governor's Veto. |
2021-04-06 | House | Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Override of Governor's Executive Veto passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-02 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |