AR HB1564 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that HB1564 is now Act 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Public Safety Act Of 2019; To Amend The Arkansas Public Safety Communications Act Of 1985; And To Develop A Next Generation 911 System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Public Safety Act Of 2019; To Amend The Arkansas Public Safety Communications Act Of 1985; And To Develop A Next Generation 911 System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseNotification that HB1564 is now Act 660
2019-03-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-27HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-03-25HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-03-20HouseRe-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-20HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-20SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-20SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-14SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-12HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-12HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-12HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback