AR HB1552 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that HB1552 is now Act 393
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that HB1552 is now Act 393
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Office Of The Governor Appropriation For The 2020-2021 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Office Of The Governor Appropriation For The 2020-2021 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Notification that HB1552 is now Act 393 |
2021-03-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-15 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-09 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2021-03-09 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |