AR HB1546 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Phase Out The Soft Drink Tax; And To Provide For Additional Amounts To Be Distributed To Offset The Revenue Reduction Resulting From The Phaseout Of The Soft Drink Tax.
Title
To Phase Out The Soft Drink Tax; And To Provide For Additional Amounts To Be Distributed To Offset The Revenue Reduction Resulting From The Phaseout Of The Soft Drink Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Lanny Fite [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] | Rep. Howard Beaty [R] | Rep. Mark Berry [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Rep. Keith Brooks [R] | Rep. Karilyn Brown [R] | Rep. Cindy Crawford [R] |
Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R] | Rep. Brian Evans [R] | Rep. Steve Hollowell [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] | Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R] | Rep. Roger Lynch [R] | Rep. Josh Miller [R] |
Rep. David Ray [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] | Rep. Keith Slape [R] | Rep. Les Warren [R] |
Sen. Lance Eads [R] | Sen. Trent Garner [R] | Sen. Ben Gilmore [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - Clincher motion failed of adoption (Y: 30 N: 52 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-04-14 | House | Clincher motion failed of adoption |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-13 | House | The vote by which HB1546 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to expunge HB 1546 vote passed |
2021-04-13 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to reconsider HB 1546 passed |
2021-04-13 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2021-04-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed |