AR HB1503 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - House Rep. Cowling, L served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1503 Failed to Pass - 03/07/2011 01:43:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - House Rep. Cowling, L served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1503 Failed to Pass - 03/07/2011 01:43:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Make It A Violation For A Minor To Possess A Tobacco Product Or Cigarette Papers.
Title
To Make It A Violation For A Minor To Possess A Tobacco Product Or Cigarette Papers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 33 N: 54 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | House Rep. Cowling, L served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1503 Failed to Pass - 03/07/2011 01:43:00 PM | |
2011-03-03 | House Read the third time and failed. | |
2011-03-02 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-23 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES | |
2011-02-23 | House Filed |