AR HB1500 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The War Memorial Stadium Commission - Capital Improvement Projects General Improvement Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The War Memorial Stadium Commission - Capital Improvement Projects General Improvement Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-30 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-28 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-15 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |