AR HB1484 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Notification that HB1484 is now Act 585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Notification that HB1484 is now Act 585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Fee For Filing And Issuing A Writ.
Title
Concerning The Fee For Filing And Issuing A Writ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Notification that HB1484 is now Act 585 |
2015-03-17 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |