AR HB1462 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1462 is now Act 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1462 is now Act 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Youths In Foster Care; And To Certify Unaccompanied Homeless Youths.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Youths In Foster Care; And To Certify Unaccompanied Homeless Youths.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Scott [D] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Rep. Keith Brooks [R] | Rep. Deann Vaught [R] |
Rep. Andrew Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1462 is now Act 506 |
2023-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-06 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-02-20 | House | Filed |