AR HB1456 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-8)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Notification that HB1456 is now Act 967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Railroad Modernization Act Of 2021; And To Allow An Income Tax Credit For Certain Railroad Track Maintenance Expenditures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Railroad Modernization Act Of 2021; And To Allow An Income Tax Credit For Certain Railroad Track Maintenance Expenditures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseNotification that HB1456 is now Act 967
2021-04-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-22HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-22HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-22SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback