AR HB1451 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1451 is now Act 479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Notification that HB1451 is now Act 479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 Regarding The Arkansas National Guard And The United States Military.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 Regarding The Arkansas National Guard And The United States Military.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Notification that HB1451 is now Act 479 |
2017-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-06 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |