AR HB1433 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that HB1433 is now Act 400
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Notification that HB1433 is now Act 400
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Various Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Enhanced Transportation Funding Amounts; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Various Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Enhanced Transportation Funding Amounts; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Notification that HB1433 is now Act 400 |
2021-03-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-03 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |