AR HB1419 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Notification that HB1419 is now Act 430
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Enrollment In An Academic Course At A Public School Or An Open-enrollment Public Charter School Of A Private School Or Home-schooled Student.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Enrollment In An Academic Course At A Public School Or An Open-enrollment Public Charter School Of A Private School Or Home-schooled Student.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseNotification that HB1419 is now Act 430
2019-03-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-07HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-07SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-28SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback