AR HB1408 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Be Known As The Permitted Open Carry Act.
Title
To Be Known As The Permitted Open Carry Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-03-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-08 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1408 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1408.pdf |