AR HB1406 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Notification that HB1406 is now Act 318
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Notification that HB1406 is now Act 318
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Limitations On The Issuance Of Military And Veterans Special License Plates; And To Authorize The Issuance Of Additional Special License Plates In Certain Circumstances.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Limitations On The Issuance Of Military And Veterans Special License Plates; And To Authorize The Issuance Of Additional Special License Plates In Certain Circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Notification that HB1406 is now Act 318 |
2021-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |