AR HB1402 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that HB1402 is now Act 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Abortion-inducing Drugs Safety Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Abortion-inducing Drugs Safety Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseNotification that HB1402 is now Act 562
2021-03-30HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-03-29HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-03-29HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-03-29SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-03-29SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-16SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2021-03-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-03HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1402&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1402/HB1402020320211250.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1402/HB1402030820211125.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1402/HB1402031520211031.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=562.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1402-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1402-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1402&rcs=2363&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1402&rcs=2474&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback