AR HB1398 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Paisley's Law; And To Amend The Stillborn Child Income Tax Credit.
Title
To Amend Paisley's Law; And To Amend The Stillborn Child Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Eaves [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed |