AR HB1375 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that HB1375 is now Act 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that HB1375 is now Act 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Designate State Highway 5, Known As The Hot Springs Bypass Extension, In Garland County As A Scenic Highway.
Title
To Designate State Highway 5, Known As The Hot Springs Bypass Extension, In Garland County As A Scenic Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Notification that HB1375 is now Act 675 |
2021-04-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed |