AR HB1366 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Notification that HB1366 is now Act 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Notification that HB1366 is now Act 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Changes To Provisions Of Law Concerning The University Of Arkansas.
Title
To Make Changes To Provisions Of Law Concerning The University Of Arkansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1366 is now Act 344 |
2015-03-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-05 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2015-03-03 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2015-03-02 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-02 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed |