AR HB1361 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Grounds For Divorce Or Separation Under The Covenant Marriage Act Of 2001; And To Add Emotional Abuse As A Grounds For Divorce And Separation Under The Covenant Marriage Act Of 2001.
Title
To Amend The Grounds For Divorce Or Separation Under The Covenant Marriage Act Of 2001; And To Add Emotional Abuse As A Grounds For Divorce And Separation Under The Covenant Marriage Act Of 2001.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed |