AR HB1359 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Abolish Certain Boards; To Create The Arkansas State Board Of Mental Health Professionals; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Abolish Certain Boards; To Create The Arkansas State Board Of Mental Health Professionals; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-16 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-02-06 | House | Filed |