AR HB1348 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - House Notification that HB1348 is now Act 600
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - House Notification that HB1348 is now Act 600
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Organizations That Regulate Extracurricular Interscholastic Activities In Grade Seven Through Twelve (7-12) In Both Public And Private Schools.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Organizations That Regulate Extracurricular Interscholastic Activities In Grade Seven Through Twelve (7-12) In Both Public And Private Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Summers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 17 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 67 N: 17 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | House Notification that HB1348 is now Act 600 | |
2011-03-22 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-21 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-21 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-11 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-10 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Education | |
2011-02-07 | House Filed |