AR HB1313 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Notification that HB1313 is now Act 283
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Notification that HB1313 is now Act 283
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The President Of The Arkansas Municipal Police Association To Designate A Representative To The Arkansas Commission On Law Enforcement Standards And Training.
Title
An Act To Authorize The President Of The Arkansas Municipal Police Association To Designate A Representative To The Arkansas Commission On Law Enforcement Standards And Training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Notification that HB1313 is now Act 283 | |
2011-03-10 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-09 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-09 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-10 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-09 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-03 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-02-03 | House Filed |