AR HB1293 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Lighting Requirements For A Motor Vehicle Used As A Wrecker Or Tow Vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Lighting Requirements For A Motor Vehicle Used As A Wrecker Or Tow Vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRecommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-03-29HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-03-28HouseReturned From the Senate as requested.
2019-03-28SenateReturned To the House as requested.
2019-03-28HouseMotion by Representative DeAnn Vaught to recall HB1293 from the Senate passed
2019-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-29HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-01-29HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback