AR HB1292 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that HB1292 is now Act 436
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that HB1292 is now Act 436
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 24 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Retirement And Pensions.
Title
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 24 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Retirement And Pensions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1292 is now Act 436 |
2023-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed |