AR HB1287 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Notification that HB1287 is now Act 575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Notification that HB1287 is now Act 575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Certain Employers With The Option To Pay A Surcharge For Embedded Employees In Lieu Of Membership In The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Provide Certain Employers With The Option To Pay A Surcharge For Embedded Employees In Lieu Of Membership In The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Rye [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Emergency Clause Failed of Adoption (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 58 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Emergency Clause Failed of Adoption (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 58 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Notification that HB1287 is now Act 575 |
2017-03-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-15 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-09 | House | Emergency Clause Failed of Adoption |
2017-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |