AR HB1281 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Propane Council For The Promotion Of The Propane Industry In Arkansas; And To Create A Referendum.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Propane Council For The Promotion Of The Propane Industry In Arkansas; And To Create A Referendum.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Richey [D] | Rep. Scott Baltz [D] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] | Rep. Laurie Rushing [R] | Rep. John Vines [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 36 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-12 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-02-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-26 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-25 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2015-02-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-19 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2015-02-06 | House | Filed |