AR HB1260 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Certain Individuals And Organizations That Engage In Charitable Solicitation To Register Within A Municipality.
Title
To Require Certain Individuals And Organizations That Engage In Charitable Solicitation To Register Within A Municipality.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] | Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Mary Bentley [R] | Rep. Howard Beaty [R] |
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] | Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R] | Rep. Marcus Richmond [R] | Rep. Brandt Smith [R] |
Rep. Rick McClure [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 33 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-03-16 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |