AR HB1257 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Require A Public School District To Employ An Individual Who Has Completed Or Will Complete The Certified Facilities Director Certification Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require A Public School District To Employ An Individual Who Has Completed Or Will Complete The Certified Facilities Director Certification Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2021-03-02HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-02HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-02HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-23HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-23HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-02-23HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-01-25HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback