AR HB1257 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Credit For Sales Or Use Taxes Paid To Another State For The Purchase Of A Motor Vehicle, A Trailer, Or A Semitrailer And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Allow A Credit For Sales Or Use Taxes Paid To Another State For The Purchase Of A Motor Vehicle, A Trailer, Or A Semitrailer And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-01 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-01 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-24 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-02 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-02 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-02 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-27 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on Revenue and Taxation | |
2011-01-27 | House Filed |