AR HB1255 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1255 is now Act 1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1255 is now Act 1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Licensing, Registration, And Certification For Certain Professions; And To Establish A System Of Endorsement, Recognition, And Reciprocity For Licensing.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Licensing, Registration, And Certification For Certain Professions; And To Establish A System Of Endorsement, Recognition, And Reciprocity For Licensing.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Notification that HB1255 is now Act 1011 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-10 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed |