AR HB1249 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Notification that HB1249 is now Act 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Notification that HB1249 is now Act 280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Authority Of A County Quorum Court To Revise, Adopt, And Codify Ordinances.
Title
Concerning The Authority Of A County Quorum Court To Revise, Adopt, And Codify Ordinances.
Sponsors
Rep. John Baine [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Notification that HB1249 is now Act 280 |
2015-02-24 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-24 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |