AR HB1231 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit The Use Of Public School Funds To Teach The 1619 Project Curriculum; And To Reduce Funds Distributed To Public Schools That Teach The 1619 Project Curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit The Use Of Public School Funds To Teach The 1619 Project Curriculum; And To Reduce Funds Distributed To Public Schools That Teach The 1619 Project Curriculum.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2021-02-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-08HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-02-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-01-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-01-21HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback