AR HB1218 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit Offering Courses, Events, And Activities That Isolate Students Based On Characteristics Within Programs Of Instruction; And To Adjust Funding For Schools That Offer These Prohibited Courses, Events, And Activities.
Title
To Prohibit Offering Courses, Events, And Activities That Isolate Students Based On Characteristics Within Programs Of Instruction; And To Adjust Funding For Schools That Offer These Prohibited Courses, Events, And Activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-01-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |