AR HB1215 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Notification that HB1215 is now Act 607
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Grant Full Practice Authority To Certified Nurse Midwives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Grant Full Practice Authority To Certified Nurse Midwives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseNotification that HB1215 is now Act 607
2021-04-01HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-03-31HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-03-31HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2021-03-30HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2021-03-09HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-09HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-03-09SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2021-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-03SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-03SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-25SenateReceived from the House.
2021-02-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-02-24HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-24HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-02-24HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-23HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-01-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-01-19HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1215&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1215/HB1215011920211334.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1215/HB1215022420211017.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1215/HB1215030320210933.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=607.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1215-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1215-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1215&rcs=2139&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1215&rcs=2224&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1215&rcs=2577&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback