AR HB1212 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Notification that HB1212 is now Act 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Notification that HB1212 is now Act 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Division Of Workforce Services Law; Concerning The Noncharge Of Employer Contributions For Certain Unemployment Insurance Claims; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Division Of Workforce Services Law; Concerning The Noncharge Of Employer Contributions For Certain Unemployment Insurance Claims; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Notification that HB1212 is now Act 153 |
2021-02-25 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-25 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-02-23 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-23 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended #1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-03 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |