AR HB1210 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-19 - Notification that HB1210 is now Act 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-19 - Notification that HB1210 is now Act 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Municipalities To Contract For Fire Service.
Title
To Allow Municipalities To Contract For Fire Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Notification that HB1210 is now Act 106 |
2015-02-18 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-17 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-17 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-05 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed |