AR HB1207 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Notification that HB1207 is now Act 1000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Notification that HB1207 is now Act 1000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Energy And Environment - Division Of Environmental Quality Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Energy And Environment - Division Of Environmental Quality Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Notification that HB1207 is now Act 1000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-21 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-14 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-04-14 | House | Amendment No. 5 failed of adoption. |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 5 |
2021-04-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-31 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |