AR HB1202 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that HB1202 is now Act 128
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that HB1202 is now Act 128
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Election Laws; To Amend Publication Requirements For Elections; And To Require Publication Of Sample Ballots On An Internet Site.
Title
To Amend Election Laws; To Amend Publication Requirements For Elections; And To Require Publication Of Sample Ballots On An Internet Site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Notification that HB1202 is now Act 128 |
2021-02-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-27 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-25 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed |