AR HB1197 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that HB1197 is now Act 402
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Notification that HB1197 is now Act 402
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Laws Regarding The Transfer Of Water Pollution Permits; To Clarify The Financial Assurance Requirements For Nonmunicipal Domestic Sewage Treatment Works; And To Create The Water Performance Bond Fund.
Title
To Clarify The Laws Regarding The Transfer Of Water Pollution Permits; To Clarify The Financial Assurance Requirements For Nonmunicipal Domestic Sewage Treatment Works; And To Create The Water Performance Bond Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Notification that HB1197 is now Act 402 |
2013-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-11 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-03-06 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed |