AR HB1192 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Notification that HB1192 is now Act 290
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Notification that HB1192 is now Act 290
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Limit The Power Of Eminent Domain For Property Owners’ Improvement Districts And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Limit The Power Of Eminent Domain For Property Owners’ Improvement Districts And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1192 is now Act 290 |
2013-03-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-04 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-25 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-02-25 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-22 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2013-02-18 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed |