AR HB1172 | 2010 | 87th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - House Notification that HB1172 is now Act 268

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Higher Education - State Teacher Education Program Grants Supplemental Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Higher Education - State Teacher Education Program Grants Supplemental Appropriation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-26 House Notification that HB1172 is now Act 268
2010-02-25 House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2010-02-25 House TO BE ENROLLED
2010-02-25 House Returned From the Senate as passed.
2010-02-25 Senate Returned to the House as Passed.
2010-02-25 Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2010-02-25 Senate Read the third time and passed.
2010-02-25 Senate Rules suspended.
2010-02-25 Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2010-02-24 Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2010-02-24 Senate Received from the House.
2010-02-24 House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2010-02-24 House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2010-02-23 House Returned by the Committee Do Pass
2010-02-22 House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee
2010-02-22 House Filed

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback