AR HB1166 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Notification that HB1166 is now Act 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Notification that HB1166 is now Act 102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Add An Additional Member To The Alzheimer's Disease And Dementia Advisory Council.
Title
To Add An Additional Member To The Alzheimer's Disease And Dementia Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Hope Duke [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] | Rep. Julie Mayberry [R] | Rep. Johnny Rye [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Notification that HB1166 is now Act 102 |
2023-02-21 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-31 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-01-31 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-01-31 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-23 | House | Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-01-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed |