AR HB1147 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - House Notification that HB1147 is now Act 138
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - House Notification that HB1147 is now Act 138
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Limit The Number Of Years That The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Benefit Participants, Or Employers May Look Back When Adjusting Obligations Between The System; To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Limit The Number Of Years That The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Benefit Participants, Or Employers May Look Back When Adjusting Obligations Between The System; To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Carnine [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | House Notification that HB1147 is now Act 138 | |
2011-02-23 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-02-23 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-02-23 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-02-23 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-22 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-22 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-21 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-08 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-08 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-08 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-01-19 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs | |
2011-01-19 | House Filed |