AR HB1141 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Notification that HB1141 is now Act 731
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Notification that HB1141 is now Act 731
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Cemetery Act For Perpetually Maintained Cemeteries.
Title
To Amend The Cemetery Act For Perpetually Maintained Cemeteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Notification that HB1141 is now Act 731 |
2021-04-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-11 | House | Filed |