AR HB1137 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Notification that HB1137 is now Act 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Notification that HB1137 is now Act 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law And To Create Funds, To Repeal Funds, And To Make Transfers To And From Funds And Fund Accounts.
Title
An Act To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law And To Create Funds, To Repeal Funds, And To Make Transfers To And From Funds And Fund Accounts.
Sponsors
Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Notification that HB1137 is now Act 259 |
2018-03-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2018-03-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2018-03-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2018-03-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2018-02-20 | House | Filed |