AR HB1136 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Notification that HB1136 is now Act 598
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [PDF]

Summary

To Require Hepatitis C Screening During Pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require Hepatitis C Screening During Pregnancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseNotification that HB1136 is now Act 598
2021-04-01HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-03-31HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-03-31HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-03-31SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-03-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-29SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-16SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-15HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15HouseAmendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 4
2021-03-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-04HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-01HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-01-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-01-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-01-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1136&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1136/HB1136011120211550.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1136/HB1136011920210942.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1136/HB1136030120211021.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1136/HB1136030420211021.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1136/HB1136031520211125.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1136/HB1136031720211542.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=598.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1136-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1136-H2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1136-H3.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1136-H4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1136&rcs=2364&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1136&rcs=2527&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback