AR HB1127 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Notification that HB1127 is now Act 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Notification that HB1127 is now Act 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Rural Emergency Hospital Act; To Authorize The Licensure Of Rural Emergency Hospitals By The Department Of Health; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Create The Rural Emergency Hospital Act; To Authorize The Licensure Of Rural Emergency Hospitals By The Department Of Health; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Johnson [R] | Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Notification that HB1127 is now Act 59 |
2023-02-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-02 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-02-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-31 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-01-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed |