AR HB1103 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that HB1103 is now Act 126
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Notification that HB1103 is now Act 126
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Arkansas Public School Academic Facilities And Transportation.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Arkansas Public School Academic Facilities And Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Evans [R] | Sen. Lance Eads [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Notification that HB1103 is now Act 126 |
2021-02-09 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-01-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-08 | House | Filed |